Barber v. City of Crescent City et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Barber
Defendant: City of Crescent City, Douglas Plack and Eric Capon
Case Number: 4:2008cv04883
Filed: October 24, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1981 Sex Discrimination

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Granting 80 Stipulation TO DISMISS ENTIRE ACTION, WITH PREJUDICE, PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT OF THE PARTIES AND FRCP RULE 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/5/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/23/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER re 76 Granting Stipulation To Continue Discovery Deadlines. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/21/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER re 73 Granting Stipulation Continuing Trial and Pre-Trial Dates. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/25/2011 02:00 PM. Jury Selection set for 2/14/2011 08:30AM. Jury Trial (5 day) set for 2/14/2011 08:30 AM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/16/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER re 71 Granting Stipulation. Case Management Statement due by 1/4/2011. Case Management Conference set for 1/11/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/13/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER re 68 Granting Amended Stupulation. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/27/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
March 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN granting 19 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barber v. City of Crescent City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Barber
Represented By: Abraham N. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Crescent City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Plack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Capon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?