Schneider et al v. State of California et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Schneider, Ronald Rosson, Beverly Thompson and Raney Dixon
Defendant: State of California, California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation, Tonya Church, Robert L. Ayers, Jr, Karen Saylor and Robert Sillen
Case Number: 4:2008cv04987
Filed: October 31, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 37 Motion to Remand (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re 30 granting STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO COMPLETE ENE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/16/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Excusing Personal Attendance at ENE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 4/10/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re 21 granting STIPULATION selecting Early Neutral Evaluation. Case referred to early neutral evaluation.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/29/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/3/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schneider et al v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Schneider
Represented By: A. Catherine Lagarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Rosson
Represented By: A. Catherine Lagarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Thompson
Represented By: A. Catherine Lagarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raney Dixon
Represented By: A. Catherine Lagarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Represented By: Bonnie J. Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation
Represented By: Bonnie J. Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonya Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Ayers, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Saylor
Represented By: Bonnie J. Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Sillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?