Sand Hill Advisors LLC v. Sand Hill Advisors LLC
Plaintiff: Sand Hill Advisors LLC
Defendant: Sand Hill Advisors LLC
Case Number: 4:2008cv05016
Filed: November 4, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Trademark Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Wayne D. Brazil
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 AMENDED ORDER re 91 Order, Terminate Motions,,,,,,. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/16/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER, Motions terminated: 84 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 61 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Sand Hill Advisors LLCREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 61 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Sand Hill Advisors LLC, 85 MOTION for Reconsideration re 84 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 61 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Sand Hill Advisors LLCREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 61 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Sand Hill Advisors LLC MOTION for Reconsideration re 84 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 61 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Sand Hill Advisors LLCREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 61 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Sand Hill Advisors LLC filed by Sand Hill Advisors LLC, 64 Report and Recommendations, Order Referring Motion, 61 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Sand Hill Advisors LLC.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/15/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER re 85 MOTION for Reconsideration re 84 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 61 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Sand Hill Advisors LLCREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 61 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Sand Hill Advisors LLC MOTION for Reconsi deration re 84 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 61 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Sand Hill Advisors LLCREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 61 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Sand Hill Advisors LLC filed by Sand Hill Advisors LLC. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/23/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 61 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Sand Hill Advisors LLC. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/22/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010)
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES re 72 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Sand Hill Advisors LLC, 75 Declaration in Support, filed by Sand Hill Advisors LLC, 73 Declaration in Support, filed by Sand Hill Advisors LLC, 76 Declaration in Support, filed by Sand Hill Advisors LLC, 74 Declaration in Support filed by Sand Hill Advisors LLC. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/5/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING: Hearing set for 04/08/2010 at 10:00 AM, re 61 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James, on 3/1/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2010) Modified on 3/2/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendant Sand Hill Advisors, LLC. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 1/26/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010) Modified on 1/27/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Pretrial Schedule. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 1/22/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010) Modified on 1/26/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 40 Ex Parte Application (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2009)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 35 Ex Parte Motion to Move the Hearing Date for Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Setting Hearing on Motion For Summary Judgment to 1/12/2010 at 01:00 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 11/19/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2009) Modified on 11/23/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/23/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER: To Allow Defendant to Amend Answer, Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 5/27/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2009) Modified on 5/29/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES - Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte, on 2/24/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009) Modified on 2/25/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sand Hill Advisors LLC v. Sand Hill Advisors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sand Hill Advisors LLC
Represented By: James Patrick Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sand Hill Advisors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?