United States Department of Justice, Executive Office for Immigration Review v. Nguyen et al
Petitioner: United States Department of Justice, Executive Office for Immigration Review
Respondent: Ni Chi Nguyen and Chung Van Do
Case Number: 4:2008cv05265
Filed: November 20, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 8:287 Petition to Enforce INS Subpoena

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 19 Motion to Relate Case C-09-2981-MEJ. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2009) Modified on 7/15/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, GRANTING 16 Motion to Vacate Case Management Conference. The Telephonic Case Management Conference is CONTINUED to 05/13/09 at 3:00 PM. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2009) Modified on 2/24/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER AND FURTHER STATUS REPORT: That the government is directed to provide the Court with a further status report within (6) six weeks of the date of this Order. re 14 Status Report Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 2/6/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009) Modified on 2/10/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/23/2009 01:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 1/20/2009. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 1/9/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2009) Modified on 1/12/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/12/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/27/2009 01:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 1/20/2009.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/6/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Department of Justice, Executive Office for Immigration Review v. Nguyen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States Department of Justice, Executive Office for Immigration Review
Represented By: Edward A. Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ni Chi Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chung Van Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?