Liedorff v. Centerone Financial Services LLC
Plaintiff: Michelle R. Liedorff
Defendant: Centerone Financial Services LLC
Case Number: 4:2008cv05455
Filed: December 4, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/13/2010. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Parties' Stipulated request to continue the motion for preliminary approval is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement Hearing set for 4/28/2010 09:00 AM. Plaintiff's mov ing papers to be filed on or before 3/24/2010, defendant's joinder papers to be filed on or before 4/7/2010, and any reply papers to be filed on or before 4/14/2010 re 40 Stipulation filed by Centerone Financial Services LLC. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/18/2010. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE FOR MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT. Motion hearing for Preliminary Approval set for 4/21/2010 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/12/2010. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER (NINETY-DAY CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL); Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/10/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending mediation deadline to 8/20/2009; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 6/30/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liedorff v. Centerone Financial Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle R. Liedorff
Represented By: Alexander B. Trueblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centerone Financial Services LLC
Represented By: Molly Rachel Newland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?