Association of Irritated Residents v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al
Plaintiff: Association of Irritated Residents
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency, Stephen L. Johnson and Wayne Nastri
Case Number: 4:2008cv05650
Filed: December 18, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:7604 Clear Air Act (Emission Standards)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re 29 Granting Stipulation TO DIMISS WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 04/05/2010. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re 27 granting STIPULATION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/27/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re 25 GRANTING STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Bill of Costs and Motion for Attorney's Fees. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 10/15/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re 19 GRANTING AS MODIFIED STIPULATION TO STAY THE CASE PENDING PUBLIC COMMENT ON THE PROPOSED CONSENT DECREE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/15/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 6/10/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re 14 granting STIPULATION to Continue Answer Deadline.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/14/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re 12 GRANTING AS MODIFIED STIPULATION TO EXTEND ANSWER DEADLINE AND TO CONTINUE INITIAL DISCOVERY, ADR REQUIREMENTS, AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/30/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 2/17/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Association of Irritated Residents v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association of Irritated Residents
Represented By: Marybelle Ngozi Nzegwu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Rochelle Leigh Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen L. Johnson
Represented By: Rochelle Leigh Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Nastri
Represented By: Rochelle Leigh Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?