Resnick et al v. Walmart.com USA LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sarah E. Grime, Eric Roslansky, Armond Faris, Gary Bunker, Andrea Resnick, A Plaintiffs, Gabriel Kra, Jonathan Groce, Brandon J Bruno, Margarita Lacabe, Paige Gabay, Kimberly Williams, Kevin Simpson, John Haley, Adrienne Belai, Melanie Polk-Stamps, Michael Orozco, Laura Randall, James Norem, Susan Horowitz, Amy Latham, Travis Wiebe and Frank Hirsch
Defendant: Netflix, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Inc. and Walmart.com USA LLC
Petitioner: Alexandra Haddad
Interested Party: Sarah Endzweig, Sanjay Parikh, Michael Weiner and Tobias L. Millrood
Case Number: 4:2009cv00002
Filed: January 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2018 Filing 164 Membership Card by Brandon J Bruno re #27 Certificate of Service. (Robert, Jordan) (Filed on 1/10/2018) Modified on 1/11/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT APPROVING SETTLEMENT BETWEEN SETTLEMENT CLASS PLAINTIFFS AND WAL-MART STORES, INC. AND WALMART.COM USA LLC, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/29/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
November 29, 2011 Filing 162 FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT NETFLIX, INC. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/29/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
November 23, 2011 Filing 161 AMENDED ORDER Granting Summary Judgment (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
June 28, 2011 Filing 160 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/20/2011, before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 7/19/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/29/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2011. (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 28, 2011 Filing 159 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/09/2011, before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 7/19/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/29/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2011. (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 7, 2011 Filing 158 NOTICE by A Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint, #30 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PETER A. BARILE III (Barile, Peter) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
February 21, 2011 Filing 157 NOTICE by Travis Wiebe // Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 2/21/2011)
September 28, 2010 Filing 156 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 24, 2010, before Judge Joseph C. Spero. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, Telephone number 415-255-6842, Joan_Columbini@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/27/2010. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
June 14, 2010 Filing 155 AMENDED CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Change Format of MDL Master Case Number. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 14, 2010 Filing 154 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Change of MDL Master Case Number Format. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
September 4, 2009 Filing 153 CLERKS NOTICE Effective September 14, 2009, Judge Phyllis Hamilton's courtroom and chambers will be located in the Oakland Courthouse, Courtroom #3, 3rd floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, California 94612.On or after September 14, 2009, all filings for matters pending on Judge Hamiltons docket, all court appearances, and all deliveries of chambers' copies of documents must be made at the Oakland Courthouse.The days and times for law and motion calendars and all currently scheduled proceedings remain unchanged.Please note that all of Judge Hamilton's case files will be moved to the Oakland Courthouse, therefore all cases numbers assigned to her will be changed slightly to reflect the correct venue. Previously, all case numbers started with "3:" to indicate the San Francisco office (Example: 3:09-cv-12345-PJH). As of September 14th, 2009, all of Judge Hamilton's case files will begin with "4:" to indicate the Oakland office, but everything else will stay the same (Example: 4:09-cv-12345-PJH). When e-filing, using the short case number format will always avoid problems when searching for the correct case: 09-12345 (YY-NNNNN).For information on the Oakland Courthouse's accessibility, parking, driving directions, public transit, hotels and other helpful links, please visit our website: http://www.cand.uscourts.gov, click on "Court Information" on the right hand side of our main page, then select the Oakland link under "Address and Jurisdiction". The main telephone number for the Oakland Division is 510 637-3530. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
July 13, 2009 Filing 152 *** FILED IN WRONG CASE. NO NEW DOCUMENT. *** ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses byWal-Mart Stores Inc., Walmart.com USA LLC. (Vose, Genevieve) (Filed on 7/13/2009) Modified on 7/15/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2009 Filing 151 *** FILED IN WRONG CASE. NO NEW DOCUMENT. *** ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed in In re Online DVD Rental Antitrust Litigation, Case No. M:09-cv-02029-PJH byNetflix, Inc.. (Jacobson, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/13/2009) Modified on 7/15/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/7/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2009)
June 9, 2009 Filing 149 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Certain Plaintiffs by Gary Bunker (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Caldes, William) (Filed on 6/9/2009)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #147 Motion to Relate Case. C 09-002 PJH AND C-09-1740 EMC ARE RELATED. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2009)
May 11, 2009 Filing 147 MOTION to Relate Case CV-09-1740 EMC filed by Adrienne Belai. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Lauren C. Russell in Support of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Relating Cases, #5 Affidavit Proof of Service)(Russell, Lauren) (Filed on 5/11/2009) Modified on 5/12/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #145 Motion to Relate Case. C 09-0002 PJH and C 09-1499 JCS ARE RELATED. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2009)
May 7, 2009 Filing 145 MOTION to Relate Case CV-09-1499 JCS filed by Gabriel Kra. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Gross, Terry) (Filed on 5/7/2009) Modified on 5/8/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2009 Filing 144 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1). (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Supplement to Pretrial Order No. 1. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/30/2009. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 142 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CENTRALIZATION OF RELATED CASES IN MDL NO. 2029. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/30/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 20, 2009 Filing 141 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/09/2009, before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/16/2009. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
April 14, 2009 Filing 140 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Haley, Amy Latham, Andrea Resnick, Eric Roslansky, Kevin Simpson, Gary Bunker re #139 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Barile, Peter) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
April 14, 2009 Filing 139 NOTICE by John Haley, Amy Latham, Andrea Resnick, Eric Roslansky, Kevin Simpson, Gary Bunker of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (JPML Order), #2 Exhibit B (JPML Schedule of Actions), #3 Exhibit C-1 MaGee (W.D. Wash.), #4 Exhibit C-2 Michalski (D. Minn.), #5 Exhibit C-3 Boynton (D.N.H.), #6 Exhibit C-4 Mayer (D. Vt.), #7 Exhibit C-5 Christina (M.D. La.), #8 Exhibit C-6 Hotard (E.D. La.), #9 Exhibit C-7 Levin (N.D. Ill.), #10 Exhibit C-8 Touchton (N.D. Ala.), #11 Exhibit C-9 Kopera (N.D. Ala.), #12 Exhibit C-10 Walters (S.D. W.Va.), #13 Exhibit C-11 Karatz (S.D. Ind.), #14 Exhibit C-12 Bowles (M.D. Fla.), #15 Exhibit C-13 Shafeek (E.D.N.Y.), #16 Exhibit C-14 Wagner (N.D. Ohio), #17 Exhibit C-15 Jones (S.D. Ill.), #18 Exhibit C-16 Ortiz-Cardona (D.P.R.), #19 Exhibit C-17 Cleary (N.D. Ill.), #20 Exhibit C-18 Spears (M.D. Fla.))(Barile, Peter) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
April 13, 2009 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Further Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2009 02:30 PM. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 138 PRETRIAL ORDER NO.1. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/13/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 137 RENUNCIATION. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/10/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 9, 2009 Filing 136 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/9/2009 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 4/9/2009). Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2009. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2009 02:30 PM. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/9/2009)
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 135 RELATED CASER ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #131 Motion to Relate Case. C-09-002 PJH AND C-09-1274 JCS ARE RELATED. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2009)
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 134 STIPULATION AND ORDER POSTPONING ADR CASE FILING REQUIREMENTS UNTIL THE ISSUES ARE ADDRESSED AT THE UPCOMING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/2/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2009) Modified on 4/2/2009 (nah, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2009 Filing 133 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Andrea Resnick. (Barile, Peter) (Filed on 4/2/2009)
April 1, 2009 Filing 132 STIPULATION re #125 ADR Clerks Notice by Andrea Resnick. (Barile, Peter) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
March 31, 2009 Filing 131 MOTION to Relate Case CV-09-1274 JCS filed by Travis Wiebe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion to Relate, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration, #3 Proposed Order To Relate Case, #4 Proof of Service)(Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 3/31/2009) Modified on 4/2/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2009 Filing 130 LETTER from Aaron H. Darsky re Withdrawal of Motion Docs #127 , #128 , and #129 . (Darsky, Aaron) (Filed on 3/30/2009) Modified on 3/30/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2009 Filing 129 *** ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED. PLEASE SEE DOC #130 . *** MOTION to Remand and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Correction of Docket #127 ) filed by James Norem. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Darsky, Aaron) (Filed on 3/27/2009) Modified on 3/30/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2009 Filing 128 *** ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED. PLEASE SEE DOC #130 . *** Proposed Order Granting Motion to Remand by James Norem. (Darsky, Aaron) (Filed on 3/27/2009) Modified on 3/30/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2009 Filing 127 *** ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED. PLEASE SEE DOC #129 and #130 . *** MOTION to Remand and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by James Norem. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Darsky, Aaron) (Filed on 3/27/2009) Modified on 3/30/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/30/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 126 RELATED CASER ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #118 Motion to Relate Case; granting #122 Motion to Relate Case. C-09-956 MEJ AND C-09-958 RMW ARE RELATED TO C-09-002 PJH. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
March 25, 2009 Filing 125 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 23, 2009 Filing 124 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walmart.com USA LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Inc. re #122 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED, #123 Declaration in Support, (Hoek, Kathryn) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
March 23, 2009 Filing 123 Declaration of Kathryn P. Hoek in Support of #122 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed byWalmart.com USA LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) #122 ) (Hoek, Kathryn) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
March 23, 2009 Filing 122 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED re CV-09-956 MEJ filed by Walmart.com USA LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Proposed Order)(Hoek, Kathryn) (Filed on 3/23/2009) Modified on 3/24/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2009 Filing 121 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alexandra Haddad re #119 Declaration in Support, #120 Proposed Order, #118 Notice (Other) (Gralewski, Robert) (Filed on 3/17/2009)
March 17, 2009 Filing 120 Proposed Order re #118 Notice (Other) Relating Cases by Alexandra Haddad. (Gralewski, Robert) (Filed on 3/17/2009)
March 17, 2009 Filing 119 Declaration of Robert J. Gralewski, Jr. in Support of #118 Notice (Other) of Related Cases; Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed byAlexandra Haddad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #118 ) (Gralewski, Robert) (Filed on 3/17/2009)
March 17, 2009 Filing 118 NOTICE by Alexandra Haddad of Related Cases to be Filed in Case No. CV 09-0002; Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related re CV-09-958 RMW (Gralewski, Robert) (Filed on 3/17/2009) Modified on 3/18/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 117 RELATED CASE ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #101 Motion to Relate Case; granting #104 Motion to Relate Case; granting #107 Motion to Relate Case. C-09-960 BZ, C-09-961 JCS AND C-09-962 MEJ ARE RELATED TO C-09-002 PJH. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2009)
March 16, 2009 Filing 116 CLERKS NOTICE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/9/2009 01:30 PM. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/2/2009. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying (97) Motion in case 3:09-cv-00002-PJH. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 16, 2009 Filing 114 Reply Memorandum re #97 MOTION Defendants' Motion for Administrative Relief to Continue Case Management Conference and Postpone Filing of Joint Case Management Statement filed byNetflix, Inc.. (Walsh, Sara) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 13, 2009 Filing 113 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Haley, Amy Latham, Andrea Resnick, Eric Roslansky, Kevin Simpson, Gary Bunker re #111 Declaration in Opposition, #110 Memorandum in Opposition, #112 Proposed Order (Alexander, Paul) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
March 13, 2009 Filing 112 Proposed Order re #110 Memorandum in Opposition, by John Haley, Amy Latham, Andrea Resnick, Eric Roslansky, Kevin Simpson, Gary Bunker. (Alexander, Paul) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
March 13, 2009 Filing 111 DECLARATION of Peter A. Barile III in Opposition to #110 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byJohn Haley, Amy Latham, Andrea Resnick, Eric Roslansky, Kevin Simpson, Gary Bunker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #110 ) (Alexander, Paul) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
March 13, 2009 Filing 110 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' #97 Motion for Administrative Relief to Continue Case Management Conference and Postpone Filing of Joint Case Management Statement filed by John Haley, Amy Latham, Andrea Resnick, Eric Roslansky, Kevin Simpson, Gary Bunker. (Alexander, Paul) (Filed on 3/13/2009) Modified on 3/17/2009 (slh, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2009 Filing 109 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walmart.com USA LLC re #108 Declaration in Support, #107 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related re CV-09-961 JCS (Hoek, Kathryn) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
March 12, 2009 Filing 108 Declaration of Kathryn P. Hoek in Support of #107 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related re CV-09-961 JCS filed byWalmart.com USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Schedule of related ND CA cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - Macias complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Resnick complaint)(Related document(s) #107 ) (Hoek, Kathryn) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
March 12, 2009 Filing 107 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related re CV-09-961 JCS filed by Walmart.com USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1 to Proposed Order)(Hoek, Kathryn) (Filed on 3/12/2009) Modified on 3/12/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2009 Filing 106 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walmart.com USA LLC re #105 Declaration in Support, #104 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related (Hoek, Kathryn) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
March 12, 2009 Filing 105 Declaration of Kathryn P. Hoek in Support of #104 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed byWalmart.com USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Schedule of related ND CA cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - Randle complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Resnick complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - Stipulation with opposing counsel)(Related document(s) #104 ) (Hoek, Kathryn) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
March 12, 2009 Filing 104 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related re CV-09-962 MEJ filed by Walmart.com USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1 to Proposed Order)(Hoek, Kathryn) (Filed on 3/12/2009) Modified on 3/12/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2009 Filing 103 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walmart.com USA LLC re #101 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related, #102 Declaration in Support, (Hoek, Kathryn) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
March 12, 2009 Filing 102 Declaration of Kathryn P. Hoek in Support of #101 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed byWalmart.com USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Schedule of related ND CA cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - Cornett complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Resnick complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - Stipulation with opposing counsel)(Related document(s) #101 ) (Hoek, Kathryn) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
March 12, 2009 Filing 101 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related re CV-09-960 BZ filed by Walmart.com USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1 to Proposed Order)(Hoek, Kathryn) (Filed on 3/12/2009) Modified on 3/12/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamiltion granting #96 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Genevieve Vose (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2009)
March 11, 2009 Filing 99 Proposed Order Continuing Case Management Conference and Postponing Filing of Joint Case Management Statement by Netflix, Inc.. (Walsh, Sara) (Filed on 3/11/2009)
March 11, 2009 Filing 98 Declaration of Sara Ciarelli Walsh in Support of #97 Defendants' Motion for Administrative Relief to Continue Case Management Conference and Postpone Filing of Joint Case Management Statement filed by Netflix, Inc.. (Walsh, Sara) (Filed on 3/11/2009) Modified on 3/11/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2009 Filing 97 MOTION Defendants' Motion for Administrative Relief to Continue Case Management Conference and Postpone Filing of Joint Case Management Statement filed by Netflix, Inc.. (Walsh, Sara) (Filed on 3/11/2009)
March 10, 2009 Filing 96 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Genevieve Vose ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611029824.) filed by Walmart.com USA LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 receipt)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
March 10, 2009 Filing 95 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Haley, Amy Latham, Andrea Resnick, Kevin Simpson, Gary Bunker re #94 Notice (Other) (Alexander, Paul) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
March 10, 2009 Filing 94 NOTICE by John Haley, Amy Latham, Andrea Resnick, Eric Roslansky, Kevin Simpson, Gary Bunker NOTICE OF FILING (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Alexander, Paul) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 RELATED CASE ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #92 Motion to Relate Case. C-09-002 PJH AND C-09-678 BZ ARE RELATED. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 19, 2009 Filing 92 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Kimberly Williams. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF LORI S. BRODY IN SUPPORT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED, #2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER RELATING CASES, #3 Affidavit PROOF OF SERVICE)(Brody, Lori) (Filed on 2/19/2009)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 RELATED CASE ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #71 Motion to Relate Case; granting #80 Motion to Relate Case; granting #81 Motion to Relate Case; granting #84 Motion to Relate Case; granting #87 Motion to Relate Case. C-09-378 MEJ, C-09-398 BZ, C-09-399 JCS, C-09-400 EDL, C-09-402 JL, C-09-434 JL, C-09-445 JCS, C-09-447 MEJ, C-09-496 MEJ, C-09-553 WDB AND C-09-554 EMC ARE RELATED TO C-09-002 PJH. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009) Modified on 2/10/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2009 Filing 90 NOTICE by John Haley, Amy Latham, Andrea Resnick, Eric Roslansky, Kevin Simpson, Gary Bunker NOTICE OF RELATED CASE PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 3-12 TO BE FILED IN CASE NO. CV-09-0002 (PJH);ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED, PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-11 (Alexander, Paul) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
February 6, 2009 Filing 89 NOTICE by John Haley, Amy Latham, Andrea Resnick, Eric Roslansky, Kevin Simpson, Gary Bunker NOTICE OF RELATED CASE PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 3-12 TO BE FILED IN CASE NO. CV-09-0002 (PJH);ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED, PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-11 (Alexander, Paul) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
February 5, 2009 Filing 88 Declaration of David W. Mitchell in Support of #87 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civil LR 3-12 abd 7-11 filed bySanjay Parikh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #87 ) (Mitchell, David) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
February 5, 2009 Filing 87 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civil LR 3-12 abd 7-11 filed by Sanjay Parikh. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mitchell, David) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
February 5, 2009 Filing 86 Proposed Order re #84 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED by Brandon J Bruno, Paige Gabay. (Heffelfinger, Christopher) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
February 5, 2009 Filing 85 Declaration of Christopher T. Heffelfinger in Support of #84 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed byBrandon J Bruno, Paige Gabay. (Related document(s) #84 ) (Heffelfinger, Christopher) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
February 5, 2009 Filing 84 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by Brandon J Bruno, Paige Gabay. (Heffelfinger, Christopher) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
February 5, 2009 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Parsons Hoek (Hoek, Kathryn) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
February 5, 2009 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal Stuart Manne (Manne, Neal) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
February 5, 2009 Filing 81 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by Tobias L. Millrood. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
February 5, 2009 Filing 80 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by Michael Weiner. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
February 5, 2009 Filing 79 Certificate of Interested Entities by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Hess, Richard) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
February 5, 2009 Filing 78 Certificate of Interested Entities by Walmart.com USA LLC identifying Corporate Parent WAL-MART STORE, INC. for Walmart.com USA LLC. (Hess, Richard) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
February 4, 2009 Filing 77 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah E. Grime. Walmart.com USA LLC served on 1/29/2009, answer due 2/18/2009. (Shapiro, Melissa) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
February 4, 2009 Filing 76 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah E. Grime. Wal-Mart Stores Inc. served on 1/29/2009, answer due 2/18/2009. (Shapiro, Melissa) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
February 4, 2009 Filing 75 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah E. Grime. Netflix, Inc. served on 1/29/2009, answer due 2/18/2009. (Shapiro, Melissa) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
February 4, 2009 Filing 74 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Margarita Lacabe re #71 MOTION to Relate Case Pursuant to Civil L. R. 3-12, #72 Declaration in Support, #73 Proposed Order (Jackson, Michele) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
February 4, 2009 Filing 73 Proposed Order re #71 MOTION to Relate Case Pursuant to Civil L. R. 3-12, #72 Declaration in Support by Margarita Lacabe. (Jackson, Michele) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
February 4, 2009 Filing 72 Declaration of Michele C. Jackson in Support of #71 MOTION to Relate Case Pursuant to Civil L. R. 3-12 filed byMargarita Lacabe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #71 ) (Jackson, Michele) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
February 4, 2009 Filing 71 MOTION to Relate Case Pursuant to Civil L. R. 3-12 filed by Margarita Lacabe. (Jackson, Michele) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
February 2, 2009 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/2/2009. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/9/2009 02:30 PM. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/2/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 RELATED CASE ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #52 Motion to Relate Case; granting #57 Motion to Relate Case. C-09-274 JL, C-09-340 MEJ, C-09-349 EMC, C-09-361 BZ, C-09-368 EMC, C-09-375 EDL, C-09-377 EDL AND C-09-391 MEJ ARE RELATED TO C-09-002 PJH. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #61 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Richard W. Hess. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
January 30, 2009 Filing 67 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Laura Randall. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF LINDA M. FONG IN SUPPORT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED;, #2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER RELATING CASES, #3 Affidavit PROOF OF SERVICE)(Fong, Linda) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 30, 2009 Filing 66 Certificate of Interested Entities by Netflix, Inc. Defendant Netflix, Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and Certification of Interested Persons Under Local Civil Rule 3-16 (Jacobson, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 30, 2009 Filing 65 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Walmart.com USA LLC on January 26, 2009, filed by Michael Orozco. (Turan, Alex) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 30, 2009 Filing 64 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Walmart.com USA LLC on January 22, 2009, filed by Melanie Polk-Stamps. (Turan, Alex) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 30, 2009 Filing 63 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Walmart.com USA LLC on January 15, 2009, filed by Armond Faris. (Turan, Alex) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 30, 2009 Filing 62 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Walmart.com USA LLC on January 15, 2009, filed by Jonathan Groce. (Turan, Alex) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 29, 2009 Filing 61 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Richard W. Hess ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611028184.) filed by Walmart.com USA LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 29, 2009 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frank Hirsch re #57 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-12 AND 7-11 (Shulman, Harry) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 29, 2009 Filing 59 Proposed Order re #57 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-12 AND 7-11 by Frank Hirsch. (Shulman, Harry) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 29, 2009 Filing 58 Declaration of Harry Shulman in Support of #57 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-12 AND 7-11 filed byFrank Hirsch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #57 ) (Shulman, Harry) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 29, 2009 Filing 57 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-12 AND 7-11 filed by Frank Hirsch. (Shulman, Harry) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 RELATED CASE ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #46 Motion to Relate Case. C-09-225 BZ, C-09-244 JCS, C-09-294 BZ AND C-09-297 MEJ ARE RELATED TO C-09-002 PJH. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 28, 2009 Filing 55 NOTICE by John Haley, Amy Latham, Andrea Resnick, Eric Roslansky, Kevin Simpson, Gary Bunker NOTICE OF RELATED CASE PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 3-12 TO BE FILED IN CASE NO. CV-09-0002 (PJH); ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED, PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-11 (Alexander, Paul) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
January 28, 2009 Filing 54 Proposed Order re #53 Declaration in Support, #52 MOTION to Relate Case by Sarah E. Grime. (Shapiro, Melissa) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
January 28, 2009 Filing 53 Declaration of Melissa Shapiro in Support of #52 MOTION to Relate Case filed bySarah E. Grime. (Related document(s) #52 ) (Shapiro, Melissa) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
January 28, 2009 Filing 52 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Sarah E. Grime. (Shapiro, Melissa) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
January 28, 2009 Filing 51 NOTICE by John Haley, Amy Latham, Andrea Resnick, Eric Roslansky, Kevin Simpson, Gary Bunker NOTICE OF RELATED CASE PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 3-12 TO BE FILED IN CASE NO. CV-09-0002 (PJH); ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED, PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-11 (Alexander, Paul) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #44 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Sara Ciarelli Walsh. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 26, 2009 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Orozco re #46 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related (Turan, Alex) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 26, 2009 Filing 48 Declaration of Alex C. Turan in Support of #46 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed byMichael Orozco. (Related document(s) #46 ) (Turan, Alex) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 26, 2009 Filing 47 Proposed Order re #46 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related by Michael Orozco. (Turan, Alex) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 26, 2009 Filing 46 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Michael Orozco. (Turan, Alex) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 RELATED CASE ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #33 Motion to Relate Case; granting #37 Motion to Relate Case. C-09-002 PJH IS RELATED TO C-09-156 JCS, C-09-180 EDL AND C-09-236 JL. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 23, 2009 Filing 44 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Sara Ciarelli Walsh ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611027937.) filed by Netflix, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 23, 2009 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Edward Morrissey (Morrissey, Stephen) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 23, 2009 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc M. Seltzer (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 21, 2009 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Andrew Sher on behalf of Netflix, Inc. (Sher, Scott) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
January 21, 2009 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Jacobson on behalf of Netflix, Inc. (Jacobson, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
January 21, 2009 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith E. Eggleton on behalf of Netflix, Inc. (Eggleton, Keith) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
January 21, 2009 Filing 38 STIPULATION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT by Walmart.com USA LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. (Morrissey, Stephen) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
January 20, 2009 Filing 37 MOTION to Relate Case NOTICE OF RELATED CASE PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 3-12 TO BE FILED IN CASE NO. CV-09-0002 (PJH); ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED,PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-11 filed by John Haley, Amy Latham, Andrea Resnick, Eric Roslansky, Kevin Simpson, Gary Bunker. (Alexander, Paul) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 20, 2009 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Armond Faris re #33 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related (Turan, Alex) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 20, 2009 Filing 35 Declaration of Alex C. Turan in Support of #33 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed byArmond Faris. (Related document(s) #33 ) (Turan, Alex) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 20, 2009 Filing 34 Proposed Order re #33 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related by Armond Faris. (Turan, Alex) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 20, 2009 Filing 33 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Armond Faris. (Turan, Alex) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RELATED CASE ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting (21) Motion to Relate Case; granting (24) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:09-cv-00002-PJH. C-09-002 PJH, C-09-096 PJH, C-09-0111 JCS, C-09-0116 EMC, C-09-0138 BZ AND C-09-139 MEJ ARE RELATED. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Thomas A. Isaacson. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Peter A. Barile III. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Robert G. Abrams. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RELATED CASE ORDER. C-09-002 PJH AND C-09-096 MEJ ARE RELATED re #11 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Kevin Simpson, Andrea Resnick, John Haley, Eric Roslansky, Amy Latham, Gary Bunker. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/14/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
January 14, 2009 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jonathan Groce, Susan Horowitz re #24 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related (Turan, Alex) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
January 14, 2009 Filing 26 Declaration of Alex C. Turan in Support of #24 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed byJonathan Groce, Susan Horowitz. (Related document(s) #24 ) (Turan, Alex) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
January 14, 2009 Filing 25 Proposed Order re #24 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related by Jonathan Groce, Susan Horowitz. (Turan, Alex) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
January 14, 2009 Filing 24 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Jonathan Groce, Susan Horowitz. (Turan, Alex) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
January 13, 2009 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sarah Endzweig re #21 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related, #22 Declaration in Support, (Heffelfinger, Christopher) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
January 13, 2009 Filing 22 Declaration of Christopher T. Heffelfinger in Support of #21 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed bySarah Endzweig. (Related document(s) #21 ) (Heffelfinger, Christopher) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
January 13, 2009 Filing 21 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Sarah Endzweig. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Relating Cases)(Heffelfinger, Christopher) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
January 13, 2009 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Haley, Amy Latham, Andrea Resnick, Eric Roslansky, Kevin Simpson, Gary Bunker. Walmart.com USA LLC served on 1/2/2009, answer due 1/22/2009; Wal-Mart Stores Inc. served on 1/2/2009, answer due 1/22/2009; Netflix, Inc. served on 1/2/2009, answer due 1/22/2009., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Haley; Amy Latham; Andrea Resnick; Eric Roslansky; Kevin Simpson; Gary Bunker (Alexander, Paul) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
January 13, 2009 Filing 19 Proposed Order re #4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Peter A. Barille III by John Haley, Amy Latham, Andrea Resnick, Eric Roslansky, Kevin Simpson, Gary Bunker. (Alexander, Paul) (Filed on 1/13/2009) Modified on 1/13/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2009 Filing 18 Proposed Order re #5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Thomas A. Isaacson by John Haley, Amy Latham, Andrea Resnick, Eric Roslansky, Kevin Simpson, Gary Bunker. (Alexander, Paul) (Filed on 1/13/2009) Modified on 1/13/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2009 Filing 17 Proposed Order re #3 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Robert G. Abrams by John Haley, Amy Latham, Andrea Resnick, Eric Roslansky, Kevin Simpson, Gary Bunker. (Alexander, Paul) (Filed on 1/13/2009) Modified on 1/13/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2009 Filing 16 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED, DISREGARD - DUPLICATE OF DOC #4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Peter A. Barile III ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 36411027090.) filed by John Haley, Amy Latham, Andrea Resnick, Eric Roslansky, Kevin Simpson, Gary Bunker. (Alexander, Paul) (Filed on 1/13/2009) Modified on 1/13/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2009 Filing 15 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED, DISREGARD - DUPLICATE OF DOC #5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Thomas A. Isaacson ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 36411027090.) filed by John Haley, Amy Latham, Andrea Resnick, Eric Roslansky, Kevin Simpson, Gary Bunker. (Alexander, Paul) (Filed on 1/13/2009) Modified on 1/13/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2009 Filing 14 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED, DISREGARD - DUPLICATE OF DOC #3 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Robert G. Abrams ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611027090.) filed by John Haley, Amy Latham, Andrea Resnick, Eric Roslansky, Kevin Simpson, Gary Bunker. (Alexander, Paul) (Filed on 1/13/2009) Modified on 1/13/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Judge Maxine M. Chesney no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/12/09. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 12, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
January 9, 2009 Filing 11 NOTICE by John Haley, Amy Latham, Andrea Resnick, Eric Roslansky, Kevin Simpson, Gary Bunker NOTICE OF RELATED CASE PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 3-12 TO BE FILED IN CASE NO. CV-09-0002 MEJ; ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED, PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-11 (Alexander, Paul) (Filed on 1/9/2009)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/9/09. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2009)
January 8, 2009 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
January 7, 2009 Filing 8 First Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by John Haley, Amy Latham, Andrea Resnick, Eric Roslansky, Kevin Simpson, Gary Bunker , on behalf of themselves and others similarily situated, Plaintiffs. (Alexander, Paul) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/7/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
January 2, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2009)
January 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 4/2/2009. Case Management Conference set for 4/9/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/2/09. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2009)
January 2, 2009 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Thomas A. Isaacson leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611027090.) filed by John Haley, Amy Latham, Andrea Resnick, Eric Roslansky, Kevin Simpson, Gary Bunker. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2009)
January 2, 2009 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Peter A. Barile III leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611027090.) filed by John Haley, Amy Latham, Andrea Resnick, Eric Roslansky, Kevin Simpson, Gary Bunker. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2009)
January 2, 2009 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney Robert G. Abrams leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611027090.) filed by John Haley, Amy Latham, Andrea Resnick, Eric Roslansky, Kevin Simpson, Gary Bunker. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2009)
January 2, 2009 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by John Haley, Amy Latham, Andrea Resnick, Eric Roslansky, Kevin Simpson, Gary Bunker re #1 Complaint, (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2009)
January 2, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT /issued summons against Walmart.com USA LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Netflix, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611027090.). Filed byJohn Haley, Amy Latham, Andrea Resnick, Eric Roslansky, Kevin Simpson, Gary Bunker. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2009: #1 Complaint) (far, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Resnick et al v. Walmart.com USA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Sarah Endzweig
Represented By: Christopher T. Heffelfinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Sanjay Parikh
Represented By: David W. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Michael Weiner
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Tobias L. Millrood
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah E. Grime
Represented By: Melissa Conwell Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Roslansky
Represented By: Thomas A. Isaacson
Represented By: Peter A. Barile, III
Represented By: Robert G. Abrams
Represented By: Emily L. Maxwell, Esq.
Represented By: Paul Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armond Faris
Represented By: Alex C. Turan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Bunker
Represented By: Thomas A. Isaacson
Represented By: Peter A. Barile, III
Represented By: William G. Caldes
Represented By: Robert G. Abrams
Represented By: Emily L. Maxwell, Esq.
Represented By: Paul Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Resnick
Represented By: Thomas A. Isaacson
Represented By: Peter A. Barile, III
Represented By: Robert G. Abrams
Represented By: Emily L. Maxwell, Esq.
Represented By: Paul Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A Plaintiffs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Kra
Represented By: Terry Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Groce
Represented By: Alex C. Turan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon J Bruno
Represented By: Christopher T. Heffelfinger
Represented By: Jordan Joseph Robert, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarita Lacabe
Represented By: Michele Chickerell Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paige Gabay
Represented By: Christopher T. Heffelfinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Williams
Represented By: Lori Sambol Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Simpson
Represented By: Thomas A. Isaacson
Represented By: Peter A. Barile, III
Represented By: Robert G. Abrams
Represented By: Emily L. Maxwell, Esq.
Represented By: Paul Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Haley
Represented By: Thomas A. Isaacson
Represented By: Peter A. Barile, III
Represented By: Robert G. Abrams
Represented By: Emily L. Maxwell, Esq.
Represented By: Paul Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrienne Belai
Represented By: Lauren Clare Capurro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Polk-Stamps
Represented By: Alex C. Turan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Orozco
Represented By: Alex C. Turan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Randall
Represented By: Linda M. Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Norem
Represented By: Aaron H. Darsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Horowitz
Represented By: Alex C. Turan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Latham
Represented By: Thomas A. Isaacson
Represented By: Peter A. Barile, III
Represented By: Robert G. Abrams
Represented By: Emily L. Maxwell, Esq.
Represented By: Paul Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Wiebe
Represented By: Matthew Rutledge Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Hirsch
Represented By: Harry Shulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netflix, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Andrew Sher
Represented By: Sara Ciarelli Walsh,
Represented By: Jonathan M. Jacobson
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Parsons Hoek
Represented By: Genevieve Vose Wallace
Represented By: Richard Wolf Hess
Represented By: Marc M. Seltzer
Represented By: Stephen Edward Morrissey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart.com USA LLC
Represented By: Neal Stuart Manne
Represented By: Kathryn Parsons Hoek
Represented By: Genevieve Vose Wallace
Represented By: Richard Wolf Hess
Represented By: Marc M. Seltzer
Represented By: Stephen Edward Morrissey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alexandra Haddad
Represented By: Robert J. Gralewski, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?