Chang v. Wells Fargo and Company et al
Plaintiff: Gerard Chang
Defendant: Wells Fargo and Company, Wells Fargo Bank and Wells Fargo and Company as Plan Administrator
Case Number: 4:2009cv00216
Filed: February 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 46 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER on Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, or in the Alternative, Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/16/09. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009) Modified on 11/20/2009 (kk, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part 31 DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND DENYING IT IN PART; AND SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER PROVIDING NOTICE TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF OF REQUIREMENTS FOR OPPOSING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2009)
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting re 19 Stipulation For Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Gerard Chang. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/20/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Answer due by 3/2/9. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/10/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chang v. Wells Fargo and Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo and Company
Represented By: Kristen Marie Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Represented By: Kristen Marie Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo and Company as Plan Administrator
Represented By: Kristen Marie Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?