Dull v. Rackable Systems Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gerald Dull
Defendant: Rackable Systems Inc., Thomas K. Barton and Madhu Ranganathan
Case Number: 4:2009cv00222
Filed: January 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Securities/Commodities Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 56 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER re 75 Stipulation REMOVING CASE FROM AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO THE ADR MULTI-OPTION PROGRAM PURSUANT TO ADR LOCAL RULE 3-3(C). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/12/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER re 67 Granting Stipulation REGARDING SCHEDULING MATTERS (AS MODIFIED). Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2010 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2010 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/18/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2010)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER re 63 Granting Stipulation Regarding the Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Defendants Motion to Dismiss and Continuation of the May 11, 2010 Case Management Conference. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/1/2010 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/12/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER re 60 Granting Stipulation Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 6/22/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/10/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER on Briefing Schedule and Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 05/06/10. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER re 54 Granting Stipulation REGARDING THE FILING OF LEAD PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT.Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 04/05/2010. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER re 51 granting STIPULATION Regarding Scheduling Matters. Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2010 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/23/10. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 17 Motion to Dismiss (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken 44 GRANTING Stipulation re Filing of Second Amended Complaint and Related Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken, on 12/28/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2009) Modified on 12/29/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re 32 granting STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULING MATTERS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/2/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re 30 granting STIPULATION re 17 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint For Violations Of The Federal Securities Laws REGARDING SCHEDULING MATTERS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/21/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2009)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re 27 granting STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULING MATTERS. Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/15/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCKET # 29 FOR CORRECT ORDER ORDER re 27 GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULING MATTERS. Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 10/15/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009) Modified on 10/16/2009 (scc, COURT STAFF).
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re 25 GRANTING AS MODIFIED STIPULATION VACATING DATE FOR INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 10/13/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re 15 granting STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULING MATTERS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/4/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re 7 GRANTING AS MODIFIED STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULING AND RELATED MATTERS. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/20/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 3/13/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dull v. Rackable Systems Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Dull
Represented By: Michael M. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rackable Systems Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas K. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madhu Ranganathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?