Colvin v. Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.
Plaintiff: Judith Colvin
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2009cv00238
Filed: January 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Labor: Other Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1330 Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/27/09. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying in part 24 Motion to (1) Withdraw as Representative Plaintiff, (2) Dismiss Plaintiff's Individual Claims Without Prejudice and (3) Conduct Discovery to Identify a Substitute Class Representative (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN denying 15 PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO VACATE COURTS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re 10 granting STIPULATION selecting Private ADR. Case referred to Private ADR.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/23/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colvin v. Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Colvin
Represented By: Gregory Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Julie L. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?