Grimes v. Barber et al
Plaintiff: Jerome L. Grimes
Defendant: Barber, Smith, Tang and San Francisco State University Police Department
Case Number: 4:2009cv00411
Filed: January 28, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1981 Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 70 Motion for Transcripts at Government's Expense. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Declarations (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 50 Motion for relief from settlement; denying 55 Motion for relief from settlement; adopting Report and Recommendations as to 58 Report and Recommendations. (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 50 MOTION for relief from settlement filed by Jerome L. Grimes Objections to R&R due by 11/2/2009. Signed by Judge Laporte on 10/19/09. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grimes v. Barber et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome L. Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco State University Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?