Lujan v. Curry
Petitioner: Leroy Paul Lujan
Respondent: Ben Curry
Case Number: 4:2009cv00462
Filed: February 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 16 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting 17 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/4/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/17/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lujan v. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leroy Paul Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ben Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?