Northern California River Watch v. Chevron U.S.A. Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Northern California River Watch
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A. Inc. and Chevron Corporation
Case Number: 4:2009cv00669
Filed: February 13, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re 40 Granting Stipulation FOR DISMISSSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/13/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re 36 Granting Stipulation Re Filing First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/19/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re 34 Granting Stipulation Re Modification of Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/23/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re 32 Granting Stipulation Regarding Confidential Information. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/12/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 28 Fourth Stipulation to Continue Initial Disclosure and Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2010 02:00 PM. Deadline for Initial Disclosures and CMC Statement has been CONTINUED to 03/30/10. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken, on 12/10/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2009) Modified on 12/11/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re 26 GRANTING Third Joint Stipulation to Continue Initial Disclosure and Case Management Conference Dates; Second Joint Stipulation for Extension of Deadline for Conducting Private ADR. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 11/5/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2009)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting re 24 Stipulation For Extension of Deadline for Conducting Mediation (Ext. to 11/11/09) filed by Northern California River Watch, Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/14/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re 22 GRANTING AS MODIFIED STIPULATION Second Joint Stipulation and to Continue Initial Disclosure and Case Management Conference Dates. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 8/24/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re 19 granting STIPULATION To Continue Initial Disclosure and CMC Dates. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/25/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/10/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northern California River Watch v. Chevron U.S.A. Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern California River Watch
Represented By: Jack Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: Robert C. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Corporation
Represented By: Robert C. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?