Malletier v. The Flea Market, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Louis Vuitton Malletier
Defendant: The Flea Market, Inc., Bumb & Associates, Brian Bumb, Timothy Bumb, George Bumb, Jr., Jeffrey Bumb and Patrick De Tar
Case Number: 4:2009cv01062
Filed: March 11, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Trademark Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/24/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2009)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re 38 granting Stipulated Request for Subsequent Case Management Conference Pursuant to Local Rule 16-10(C). Further Case Management Conference set for 11/24/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/27/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re 36 granting STIPULATION RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/25/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re 31 granting STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 8/4/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/9/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN granting 22 Motion to Dismiss (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malletier v. The Flea Market, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Vuitton Malletier
Represented By: Harry R. Schafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Flea Market, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bumb & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Bumb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Bumb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Bumb, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Bumb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick De Tar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?