Bender v. Intersil Corporation
Plaintiff: Gregory Bender
Defendant: Intersil Corporation
Case Number: 4:2009cv01155
Filed: January 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER re 53 granting STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims and Counterclaims with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/23/10. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER re 51 granting STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Mediation. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/22/10. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/24/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2009)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/17/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST re 45 Letter filed by Gregory Bender. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/12/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 29 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE DISCOVERY DISPUTES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/23/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 INITIAL DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/22/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 12 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bender v. Intersil Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Bender
Represented By: David Noel Kuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intersil Corporation
Represented By: Gregory Louis Lippetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?