Evins v. Curry
Petitioner: William L. Evins
Respondent: Ben Curry
Case Number: 4:2009cv01345
Filed: March 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/15/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PETITIONER TO FILE TRAVERSE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/2/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/21/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2010)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/25/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evins v. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William L. Evins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ben Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?