Dobrocke et al v. Allis-Chalmers Corporation Product Liability Trust et al
Plaintiff: Darlene Dobrocke and John Dobrocke
Defendant: Flour Daniel, Foster Wheeler LLC, Allis-Chalmers Corporation Product Liability Trust, Bucyrus International, Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc., Trane US, Inc., Asbestos Corporation Limited, Flour Maintenance, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Flour Corporation, General Electric Company, Thomas Dee Engineering Co. Inc., Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Metalclad Insulation Corporation, Garlock Sealing Technologies LLC, C.C. Moore & Co. Engineers, Owens-Illinois Inc., Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Sequoia Ventures, Inc., Coltec Industries Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Bechtel Corporation (DE), Bayer Cropscience, Inc. successor to Amchem Products, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation and General Dynamics Corporation
Case Number: 4:2009cv01456
Filed: April 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pl
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2009. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2009 Filing 25 Acknowledgment Receipt from San Francisco County Superior Court. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2009)
June 2, 2009 Filing 24 MDL ORDER Vacating Conditional Transfer Order (MDL 875) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2009)
May 27, 2009 Filing 23 Clerk's Letter to San Francisco County Superior Court re remanding case. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2009)
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #10 Motion to Remand (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 14, 2009 Filing 21 Reply to Opposition TO MOTION TO REMAND filed byJohn Dobrocke, Darlene Dobrocke. (Grant, Richard) (Filed on 5/14/2009) Modified on 5/15/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2009 Filing 20 Memorandum in Opposition filed byFoster Wheeler LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 2 through 6 ISO Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 7 through 11 ISO Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand 3 of 3)(Moses, Thomas) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
April 22, 2009 Filing 19 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by John Dobrocke, Darlene Dobrocke. (Grant, Richard) (Filed on 4/22/2009)
April 21, 2009 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bayer Cropscience, Inc. successor to Amchem Products, Inc. (Moses, Thomas) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 21, 2009 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint byBayer Cropscience, Inc. successor to Amchem Products, Inc.. (Moses, Thomas) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 21, 2009 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Union Carbide Corporation (Moses, Thomas) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 21, 2009 Filing 15 Notice of Refiling State Court ANSWER to Complaint byUnion Carbide Corporation. (Moses, Thomas) (Filed on 4/21/2009) Modified on 4/22/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2009 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint byFoster Wheeler LLC. (Moses, Thomas) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 14, 2009 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Dobrocke, Darlene Dobrocke re #12 Proposed Order, #11 Declaration in Support, #10 MOTION TO REMAND CASE TO CALIFORNIA SUPERIOR COURT (Grant, Richard) (Filed on 4/14/2009) Modified on 4/15/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2009 Filing 12 Proposed Order re #10 MOTION TO REMAND CASE TO CALIFORNIA SUPERIOR COURT by John Dobrocke, Darlene Dobrocke. (Grant, Richard) (Filed on 4/14/2009) Modified on 4/15/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2009 Filing 11 Declaration of Richard M. Grant in Support of #10 MOTION TO REMAND CASE TO CALIFORNIA SUPERIOR COURT filed byJohn Dobrocke, Darlene Dobrocke. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Grant, Richard) (Filed on 4/14/2009) Modified on 4/15/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2009 Filing 10 MOTION TO REMAND CASE TO CALIFORNIA SUPERIOR COURT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by John Dobrocke, Darlene Dobrocke. Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Grant, Richard) (Filed on 4/14/2009) Modified on 4/15/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2009 Filing 9 Amended ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Claudia Wilken for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge James Larson no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/9/09. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2009)
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Claudia Wilken for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge James Larson no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/9/09. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2009)
April 9, 2009 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2009)
April 8, 2009 Filing 5 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Moses, Thomas) (Filed on 4/8/2009)
April 2, 2009 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Foster Wheeler LLC re #1 Notice of Removal (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2009)
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/8/2009. Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2009 10:30 AM.. Signed by Judge James Larson on 4/2/09. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2009)
April 2, 2009 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement filed byFoster Wheeler LLC. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2009)
April 2, 2009 Filing 2 NOTICE OF TAG ALONG ACTION by Foster Wheeler LLC (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2009) (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2009 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL /no process from San Francisco County. Their case number is CGC 09-275062. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 34611030661). Filed byFoster Wheeler LLC. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/6/2009: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (cp, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2009: #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I (part 1), #10 Exhibit I (part 2), #11 Exhibit I (part 3), #12 Exhibit I (part 4), #13 Exhibit I (part 5), #14 Exhibit I (part 6), #15 Exhibit I (part 7), #16 Exhibit I (part 8), #17 Exhibit I (part 9)) (cp, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2009: #18 Exhibit I (part 10), #19 Exhibit I (part 11), #20 Exhibit I (part 12)) (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dobrocke et al v. Allis-Chalmers Corporation Product Liability Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flour Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: Edward R. Hugo
Represented By: Thomas Jeffery Moses
Represented By: James Carl Parker,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allis-Chalmers Corporation Product Liability Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bucyrus International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asbestos Corporation Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flour Maintenance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flour Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Dee Engineering Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garlock Sealing Technologies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.C. Moore & Co. Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens-Illinois Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequoia Ventures, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coltec Industries Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bechtel Corporation (DE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Cropscience, Inc. successor to Amchem Products, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Jeffery Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Thomas Jeffery Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Dobrocke
Represented By: Richard Martin Grant
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Dobrocke
Represented By: Richard Martin Grant
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?