Isreal v. Hedgpeth et al
Case Number: 4:2009cv01525
Filed: April 7, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 43 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 18 PENDING MOTION (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 32 Motion for Extension of Time to File (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Mailing) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to File (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 22 DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/24/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Isreal v. Hedgpeth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?