Tanner et al v. Bayer Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Bridget Renee Tanner and Russell Tanner
Defendant: Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer HealthCare, LLC, Berlex Laboratories International, Inc., Bayer Schering Pharma AG, Bayer AG, Schering AG and McKesson Corporation
Case Number: 4:2009cv01558
Filed: April 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 81 Motion to Relate Case: C-09-4725-SBA (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2009) Modified on 10/27/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 76 Motion to Relate Case; granting 78 Motion to Relate Case (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2009)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 7/15/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2009) Modified on 7/17/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, DENYING 18 Motion to Remand. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009) Modified on 6/18/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 30 Motion to Relate Case; GRANTING 32 Motion to Relate Case in case 4:09-cv-01558-SBA (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009) Modified on 6/16/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 11 12 Motion RELATING CASES (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tanner et al v. Bayer Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget Renee Tanner
Represented By: Lowell W. Finson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Tanner
Represented By: Lowell W. Finson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Represented By: Julie Erin Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Erin Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer HealthCare, LLC
Represented By: Julie Erin Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berlex Laboratories International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Schering Pharma AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schering AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: David Anthony Gabianelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?