Herrington v. Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies Inc et al
Plaintiff: Theresa Herrington
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies Inc and L'Oreal USA Inc
Case Number: 4:2009cv01597
Filed: April 10, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER CLOSING CASE. Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/23/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 209 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY DISCOVERY, ETC. re 208 Stipulation filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/10/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 133 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER re Joint Discovery Protocal 205 Letter filed by L'Oreal USA Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/10/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 173 Defendant's Motion to Stay; and Requiring Further Meet and Confer Re 167 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and 177 Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Discovery Protocol. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER resetting motion (#167) from 7/14/10 to 7/28/10 183 Stipulation filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/30/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 171 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/4/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 129 AMENDED Order with Signature by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING in Part 126 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Briefing in Excess of Twenty-Five Pages and to Modify Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/29/2010. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER re 111 granting STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2010 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/23/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING ACTION.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 8/24/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER re 50 GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES. Motions terminated: 43 Joint MOTION for Administrative Relief Re: Twelve Week Continuance of The August 4, 2009 Initial Case Management Conference and Extension of Initial Disclosures and Case Management Deadlines filed by Joy Sarjent. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 8/3/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrington v. Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Herrington
Represented By: Joseph N. William
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies Inc
Represented By: Steven Michael Selna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'Oreal USA Inc
Represented By: Stephanie Anne Sheridan, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?