Davidson v. Korman et al
Plaintiff: Evelyn Davidson
Defendant: Carl E. Korman and Pete Geren
Case Number: 4:2009cv01695
Filed: April 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG DENIED as moot 41 Motion to Shorten Time; DENIED as moot 41 Motion TO DELAY TRANSFER (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 17 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(1) filed by Carl E. Korman, Pete Geren, ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/3/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER: That the Case Management Conference is CONTINUED to 10/8/2009 03:45 PM., via Telephone. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 9/8/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2009) Modified on 9/9/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davidson v. Korman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl E. Korman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Geren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?