Wyant v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Richard A. Wyant
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 4:2009cv01723
Filed: April 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Mendocino
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 26 FOR THE AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/23/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 23 TO VOLUNTARY REMAND AND TO ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. by Judge Richard Seeborg Stipulation filed by Michael J. Astrue, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/12/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 19 . Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/24/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2010)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 16 PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION OF 30 DAYS THROUGH 5/24/2010 TO FILE THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/20/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wyant v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A. Wyant
Represented By: Harvey Peter Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?