Scott v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Randolph T. Scott
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 4:2009cv01841
Filed: April 28, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/11/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING 80 Stipulation filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. Signed by Judge Beeler on 1/7/11. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 AMENDED ORDER re 77 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/3/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 4/18/2011 08:30 AM. Motions due by 11/16/2010. Pretrial Conference set for 4/12/2011 01:00 PM.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/8/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 INITIAL DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 8/12/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions due by 9/7/2010. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/14/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2010) Modified on 7/16/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/3/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Discovery Cut-Off Date. Discovery due by 6/5/2010. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 12/21/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009) Modified on 12/23/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/14/2009 04:00 PM.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/18/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Case referred to early neutral evaluation.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 8/24/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph T. Scott
Represented By: Michael B. Horrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Sheena V. Jain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?