Association of Irritated Residents v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al
Plaintiff: Association of Irritated Residents
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency, Lisa P. Jackson and Laura Yoshii
Case Number: 4:2009cv01890
Filed: April 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:7604 Clear Air Act (Emission Standards)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re 27 Granting Stipulation TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/28/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re 25 Granting Stipulation. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 04/08/2010. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re 21 granting STIPULATION to extend deadline to file bill and motion for costs. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 03/22/2010. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re 17 order granting as modified STIPULATION TO STAY THE CASE PENDING PUBLIC COMMENT ON THE PROPOSED CONSENT DECREE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/13/2010 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/23/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re 14 granting STIPULATION TO CONTINUE ANSWER, INITIAL DISCOVERY, & ADR DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/13/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re 12 GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND ANSWER DEADLINE AND TO CONTINUE INITIAL DISCOVERY, ADR REQUIREMENTS, AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 7/14/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Association of Irritated Residents v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association of Irritated Residents
Represented By: Brent Joseph Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Rochelle Leigh Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa P. Jackson
Represented By: Rochelle Leigh Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Yoshii
Represented By: Rochelle Leigh Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?