Gomez v. Wachovia Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Maria Delaluz Gomez
Defendant: Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings Inc and Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation
Case Number: 4:2009cv02111
Filed: May 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING 17 Motion to Dismiss and REMANDING CASE to the Superior Court of California, County of Contra Costa. All pending matters are TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 3/22/10. ***Civil Case Terminated.. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010) Modified on 3/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 17 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint by 01/29/10. A Case Management Conference is set for 3/4/2010 at 02:30 PM., via Telephone. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 1/15/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2010) Modified on 1/20/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by World Savings Inc, Wachovia Mortgage Corporation. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/13/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 6 Stipulation filed by Wachovia Mortgage Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/29/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez v. Wachovia Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Delaluz Gomez
Represented By: James Edward Curtis, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Frederick James Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Savings Inc
Represented By: Frederick James Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation
Represented By: Robin Prema Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?