Raytheon Applied Signal Technology, Inc. v. Emerging Markets Communications, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Applied Signal Technology, Inc.
Defendant: Emerging Markets Communications, Inc., Paradise Datacom, LLC, Viasat, Inc. and EMC Satcom Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2009cv02180
Filed: May 18, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2012 355 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/3/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
April 9, 2012 352 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/9/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
March 29, 2012 349 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 345 Stipulation (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 14, 2012 339 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 324 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
March 12, 2012 331 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 324 Request to File Joint Discovery Letter Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/12/2012. (dmrlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
March 9, 2012 327 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 322 Stipulation (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
March 7, 2012 323 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 321 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Without Prejudice.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2012)
March 2, 2012 320 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 319 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Without Prejudice.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
January 17, 2012 318 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/24/2012.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/17/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
January 9, 2012 314 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REOPENING CASE, CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/20/2012. Jury Trial set for 9/5/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Motions due by 6/19/2012. Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2012 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/6/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
December 28, 2011 309 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/28/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2011)
December 23, 2011 307 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING FINAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/23/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2011)
December 22, 2011 305 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/22/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
December 20, 2011 303 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Telephone Conference set for 12/22/2011 at 08:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/20/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
December 13, 2011 300 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 299 Applied Signal Technology, Inc.'s and Comtech EF Data Corp's Application to Bring Electronic Items into the Courthouse. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/12/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
December 12, 2011 298 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 297 Application to Bring Electronic Items Into the Courthouse filed by Emerging Markets Communications, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/12/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
November 29, 2011 295 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 294 Motion to Appear by Telephone (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
November 16, 2011 292 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 287 Joint Motion for Extension of Relief from the Case Management Scheduling Conference Order and Status Report on the Progress of Settlement filed by Emerging Markets Communications, Inc., Comtech EF Data Corporation, EMC Satcom Technologies, Inc., Applied Signal Technology, Inc.. Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2012 03:45 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/15/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
November 15, 2011 291 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 282 10/7/2011 Joint Discovery Letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/15/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
October 26, 2011 286 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Phone Conference re 282 Joint Discovery Letter. Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 11/14/2011 1:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/26/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
October 13, 2011 284 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 283 Joint MOTION for Extension of Relief from the Case Management Scheduling Conference Order and Joint Status Report on the Progress of Settlement filed by Emerging Markets Communications, Inc., Comtech EF Data Corporation, EMC Satcom Technologies, Inc., Applied Signal Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/12/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
August 30, 2011 278 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 276 Joint MOTION Joint Status Report of the Progress of Settlement Between Applied Signal, Comtech EF Data, Emerging Markets Communications, and EMC Satcom Technologies, and Request for Extension of Relief from the Case Management Scheduling Conference Orde filed by Emerging Markets Communications, Inc., Comtech EF Data Corporation, EMC Satcom Technologies, Inc., Applied Signal Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 8/30/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
June 14, 2011 262 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 261 Joint MOTION Status Report on the Progress of Settlement Between Applied Signal, Comtech EF Data, Emerging Markets Communications, and EMC Satcom Technologies, and Request for Extension of Relief from the Case Management Scheduling Conference Order filed by Emerging Markets Communications, Inc., Comtech EF Data Corporation, EMC Satcom Technologies, Inc., Applied Signal Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/13/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
May 24, 2011 258 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 251 MOTION for Extension of Relief from the Case Management Scheduling Conference; Joint Status Report on the Progress of Settlement filed by Emerging Markets Communications, Inc., Comtech EF Data Corporation, EMC Satcom Technologies, Inc., Applied Signal Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/19/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 16, 2011 252 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/16/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2011)
May 12, 2011 247 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 245 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
May 9, 2011 243 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE JOINT STATUS REPORT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Zimmerman for Settlement. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/9/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
May 5, 2011 238 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 237 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
May 3, 2011 234 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 233 Status Report, filed by Emerging Markets Communications, Inc., Comtech EF Data Corporation, EMC Satcom Technologies, Inc., Applied Signal Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/2/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
March 18, 2011 228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 227 Status Report, filed by Emerging Markets Communications, Inc., Comtech EF Data Corporation, EMC Satcom Technologies, Inc., Applied Signal Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/17/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
February 18, 2011 219 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 218 Status Report filed by Emerging Markets Communications, Inc., Comtech EF Data Corporation, EMC Satcom Technologies, Inc., Applied Signal Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/18/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 9, 2011 217 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 213 Claims Construction / Markman Hearing,. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/9/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
January 20, 2011 211 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu GRANTING 178 Defendants Viasat, Inc. and Paradise Datacom LLC's Motion for Protective Order. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
November 12, 2010 193 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 191 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 191 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 178 MOTION for Protective Order and Proposed Order, 178 MOTI ON for Protective Order Applied Signal Technology, Inc. and Comtech EF Data Corp's Responses due by 11/18/2010. ViaSat, Inc. and Paradise Datacom, LLC's Replies due by 11/30/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu 11/12/10. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
October 27, 2010 188 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 185 Status Report, filed by Emerging Markets Communications, Inc., Comtech EF Data Corporation, EMC Satcom Technologies, Inc., Applied Signal Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/27/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2010)
October 25, 2010 186 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE AND ORDER VACATING AND RESETTING HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, AND ORDER RE MOTION PROCEDURES. Previously-noticed hearing date of 1/11/2011 on Defendants' Motion for Protective Order 178 has been reset before Magistrate Judge Ryu for 1/13/2011 at 11:00 AM, Courtroom 4, 3rd Fl., Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/25/2010. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
September 28, 2010 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 169 Status Report, filed by Emerging Markets Communications, Inc., Comtech EF Data Corporation, EMC Satcom Technologies, Inc., Applied Signal Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/27/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 15, 2010 168 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/14/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 13, 2010 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 160 Status Report, filed by Emerging Markets Communications, Inc., Comtech EF Data Corporation, EMC Satcom Technologies, Inc., Applied Signal Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/13/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
August 24, 2010 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 156 Motion TO DESIGNATE ADDITIONAL TERMS (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 12, 2010 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 151 Stipulation to Relieve Emerging Markets Communications, Inc. and EMC Satcom Technologies, Inc., from Compliance with Case Management Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 8/12/10. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
July 29, 2010 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SEALING TRANSCRIPT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 7/29/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
July 21, 2010 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman GRANTING 133 Motion to Bring Electronics Into Courthouse (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010) Modified on 7/22/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2010 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 7/16/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
June 10, 2010 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/10/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
May 19, 2010 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 6/1/2010.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/19/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
May 17, 2010 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR STATUS CONFERENCE re 98 Letter, filed by Emerging Markets Communications, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/17/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
April 27, 2010 92 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Claims Construction Hearing set for 12/2/2010 09:00 AM. Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2010 09:00 AM.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/26/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
March 24, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE set for 03/26/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/24/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010) Modified on 3/25/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2010 75 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE to 05/20/2010 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/9/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010) Modified on 3/11/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2010 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING FURTHER TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE: VIASAT AND PARADISE DATECOM. Telephonic Conference set for 03/12/10 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman, on 3/9/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010) Modified on 3/10/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 3, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR FURTHER NEGOTIATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/3/2010. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
March 2, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING COMTECH'S ATTENDANCE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/2/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
February 25, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING FURTHER TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE to 03/02/2010 at 8:45 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman, on 2/25/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010) Modified on 2/26/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 23, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE: Telephonic Conference set for 03/02/10 at 4:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/23/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010) Modified on 2/24/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE for 02/25/10 at 1:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/19/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010) Modified on 2/22/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE to 02/23/2010 at 3:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/8/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010) Modified on 2/10/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - PATENT CASE - RE: VIASAT AND PARADISE. A Telephonic Conference is set for 02/08/10 at 3:00 PM and Settlement Conference is set for 03/25/10 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/22/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2009) Modified on 12/23/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE DEVISING A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULE FOR PATENT CASE: Telephonic hearing set for 12/10/09 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman, on 12/1/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009) Modified on 12/3/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2009 03:00 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/2/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raytheon Applied Signal Technology, Inc. v. Emerging Markets Communications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Applied Signal Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Barry Norman Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerging Markets Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paradise Datacom, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Scott Marchese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viasat, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Scott Marchese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMC Satcom Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?