Sims v. Puggio et al
Plaintiff: Rusty Alan Sims
Defendant: Leanord F. Puggio and Shawn Manning
Case Number: 4:2009cv02519
Filed: June 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/2/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 31 Motion for Extension of Time to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re 28 Letter filed by Rusty Alan Sims. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/23/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 4 Motion for Order of Service (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2010) Modified on 3/31/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sims v. Puggio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rusty Alan Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leanord F. Puggio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?