Khalilpour v. Cellco Partnership
Plaintiff: Mahbod Khalilpour
Defendant: Cellco Partnership
Case Number: 4:2009cv02712
Filed: June 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT, CERTIFYING THE SETTLEMENT CLASS, AND PROVIDING FOR NOTICE OF HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/22/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 49 REQUEST FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 7/7/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/13/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/22/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 44 Stipulation filed by Mahbod Khalilpour Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/7/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/5/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STANDBY ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/4/2010 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 10/28/2010. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/25/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 36 RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/4/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 04/01/2010. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re 28 granting STIPULATION Modifying Case Schedule. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/22/2010 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2010 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/14/10. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re 13 granting STIPULATION To Allow Filing Of First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/17/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khalilpour v. Cellco Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mahbod Khalilpour
Represented By: Amelia D. Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cellco Partnership
Represented By: Penelope Athene Preovolos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?