Rodriguez v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Naomi Rodriguez
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 4:2009cv02803
Filed: March 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/27/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Directing Plaintiff to file Consent/Declination before Magistrate Judge form by 03/05/10; Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 03/16/10 and Directing parties to adhere to Procedural Order for Social Security Review Actions. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 3/3/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010) Modified on 3/5/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/27/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/7/2010: This case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution unless plaintiff files a motion for summary judgment by January 15, 2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman denying 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 12/16/2009.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/7/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/9/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Rodriguez
Represented By: Nancy Katherine McCombs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: Shea Lita Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?