Soto v. Commercial Recovery Systems, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jorge Soto
Defendant: Commercial Recovery Systems, Inc. and Chase Home Finance LLC
Case Number: 4:2009cv02842
Filed: June 25, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2012 109 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 108 Stipulation filed by Jorge Soto. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/24/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
December 22, 2011 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/22/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
December 12, 2011 102 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE OPPOSITION AND REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re 98 Stipulation filed by Commercial Recovery Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/12/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 5, 2011 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton Denying 66 Motion for Class Certification (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
October 14, 2011 81 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FURTHER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 80 Stipulation filed by Commercial Recovery Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/14/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 11, 2011 79 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES TO PARTICIPATE IN MEDIATION re 78 Stipulation filed by Jorge Soto. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/11/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
September 2, 2011 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing hearing date. Motion Hearing set for 11/23/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/2/2011. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
May 3, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FURTHER EXTENDING DEADLINES TO FILE MOTIONS FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND EXTENDING MEDIATION DEADLINE AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT re 63 Stipulation filed by Jorge Soto. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/3/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
April 4, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu Regarding 57 March 7, 2011 Joint Discovery Letter and Denying 50 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
February 18, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Reference to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 2/18/2011. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
November 30, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FURTHER EXTENDING DEADLINES TO FILE MOTIONS FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: Plaintiff's deadline for filing a motion for class certification is 5/2/2011 and CRS' deadline for filing a summary j udgment motion is 6/6/2011. Defendant CRS has discretion to file its motion for summary judgment prior to plaintiff filing his motion for class certification if it chooses to do so re 40 Stipulation filed by Jorge Soto. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/30/10. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soto v. Commercial Recovery Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Soto
Represented By: Cynthia Lynn Singerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Recovery Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance LLC
Represented By: George Geoffrey Weickhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?