Morgenstein v. AT&T Mobility, LLC
Plaintiff: David Morgenstein
Defendant: AT&T Mobility, LLC
Case Number: 4:2009cv03173
Filed: July 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/31/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 2/24/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010) Modified on 2/25/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE OF REFERENCE, TIME AND PLACE OF HEARING; ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER AND FILE JOINT LETTER. Lead trial counsel to meet and confer not later than 1/12/10. Joint letter of meet and confer results due by 1/12/2010, re 47 Motion to Compel set for 1/15/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 01/05/2010. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010) Modified on 1/6/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/6/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING 7 Motion to Remand, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 10 Motion to Strike Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 12/29/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2010) Modified on 1/5/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING 7 Motion to Remand; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 10 Motion to Strike (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2009) Modified on 12/30/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: That the Settlement Conference is set for 11/9/10 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor 45 Golden Gate Ave., S.F., CA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/17/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009) Modified on 12/18/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/3/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING 15 Motion to Stay, GRANTING 24 Motion to Strike (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2009) Modified on 9/18/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgenstein v. AT&T Mobility, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Morgenstein
Represented By: Kassra Powell Nassiri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility, LLC
Represented By: John Nadolenco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?