L. v. Shoreline Unified School District
Plaintiff: D. L.
Defendant: Shoreline Unified School District
Case Number: 4:2009cv04753
Filed: October 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1401 Education: Handicapped Child Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Court shall retain jurisdiction for the limited purpose of resolving disputes arising out of the parties' Compromise and Release Agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/13/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER SETTING HEARING. Hearing re 71 Joint Stipulation and Request for Court to Set Hearing to Approve Compromise and Release Agreement has been set for 1/13/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/7/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 55 Motion for Leave to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER ON SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/3/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 40 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document 25 Exhibit 1 to the Memorandum in Opposition. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2010) Modified on 4/1/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 22 Motion to Seal Administrative Record (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010) Modified on 3/25/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING 19 Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and GRANTING Request for Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction. The Motion Hearing is set for 04/20/10 at 1:00 PM., in Courtroom 1, U.S. District Court, 1301 Clay St., Ste. 11000, Oakland, CA 94612 (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2010) Modified on 3/18/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/7/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L. v. Shoreline Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. L.
Represented By: Margaret Mary Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shoreline Unified School District
Represented By: Gregory Alan Wedner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?