Johnstone v. City of San Carlos et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Johnstone
Defendant: City of San Carlos, County of San Mateo, Jeff McCourtie, James P. Fox, Stephen M Wagstaffe and Rick Good
Case Number: 4:2009cv04872
Filed: October 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 75 Motion for Summary Judgment (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Requiring Further Briefing. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/6/2011. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 1/28/2011. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER VOLUNTARILY DISMISSING DEFENDANTS JAMES P. FOX, STEPHEN M. WAGSTAFFE AND RICK GOOD re 38 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Matthew Johnstone. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/29/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 18 Motion to Dismiss; granting 20 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/16/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 2/5/2010. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/24/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2009)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT; ORDER SCHEDULING CMC. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/22/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnstone v. City of San Carlos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Johnstone
Represented By: Andrew Field Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Carlos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Mateo
Represented By: David Abraham Silberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff McCourtie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James P. Fox
Represented By: David Abraham Silberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen M Wagstaffe
Represented By: David Abraham Silberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Good
Represented By: David Abraham Silberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?