Cardenas et al v. Americredit Financial Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Juan A. Cardenas and Florencia Herrera de Cardenas
Defendant: Americredit Financial Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2009cv04978
Filed: October 19, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 92 Motion to Stay and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING the action. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 07/19/11 (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011) Modified on 7/20/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER REOPENING CASE Case Management Conference set for 7/26/2011 01:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2011 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/1/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 76 Motion to Stay (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER, Motions terminated: 9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and MOTION to Dismiss , or Alternatively MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Americredit Financial Services, Inc., 27 MOTION to Strike filed by Americredit Financial Services, Inc.. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2010 02:30 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/13/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/22/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER re 30 MOTION for Leave to FileMotion to Disregard Arguments in Reply Brief, or in the Alternative, Motion for Leave to Respond to Arguments filed by Florencia Herrera de Cardenas, Juan A. Cardenas, 9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and MOTION to Dismiss , or Alternatively MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Americredit Financial Services, Inc., 27 MOTION to Strike filed by Americredit Financial Services, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/9/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/26/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cardenas et al v. Americredit Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Americredit Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Craig A. Pinedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan A. Cardenas
Represented By: Andrew J. Ogilvie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florencia Herrera de Cardenas
Represented By: Andrew J. Ogilvie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?