Baker et al v. Aegis Wholesale Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Virgil A. Baker, Charles B. Lowery, Elizabete Lowery, Ellanore Largent and David Largent
Defendant: Residential Funding Company, LLC and Countrywide Home Loans Inc.
Case Number: 4:2009cv05280
Filed: November 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT COUNTRYWIDE re 99 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Countrywide Home Loans Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/20/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: ADJOURNING CASE DEADLINES re 91 Stipulation filed by Charles B. Lowery, Virgil A. Baker, David Largent, Elizabete Lowery, Ellanore Largent. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/20/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER TO CONTINUE CLASS CERTIFICATION HEARING AND BRIEFING DATES AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT re 81 Stipulation, filed by Charles B. Lowery, Virgil A. Baker, David Largent, Countrywide Home Loans Inc., Elizabete Lowery, Residential Funding Company, LLC, Ellanore Largent. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/5/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER re 75 Stipulation filed by Countrywide Home Loans Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/11/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 SECOND STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO ANSWER re 69 Stipulation filed by Countrywide Home Loans Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/30/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER re 57 Stipulation, filed by Countrywide Home Loans Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/6/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting 45 Motion to Dismiss in Part and Denying it in Part (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 42 Stipulation, filed by Charles B. Lowery, Virgil A. Baker, David Largent, Elizabete Lowery, Ellanore Largent. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/8/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/19/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Clerk's Notice that C-07-4485-CW and C-09-5280-PJH are NOT related (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT AEGIS WHOLESALE CORPORATION re 21 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Charles B. Lowery, Virgil A. Baker, David Largent, Elizabete Lowery, Ellanore Largent. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/15/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
December 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF REFERRAL PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-12(C) TO DETERMINE IF CASES ARE RELATED. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/2/2009. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2009)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Defendant Residential Funding Company, LLC to file consent/declination. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/16/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker et al v. Aegis Wholesale Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgil A. Baker
Represented By: Lee A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles B. Lowery
Represented By: Lee A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabete Lowery
Represented By: Lee A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellanore Largent
Represented By: Lee A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Largent
Represented By: Lee A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Funding Company, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Anthony Solitro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans Inc.
Represented By: Brooks Russell Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?