Elder-Evins v. Casey et al
Plaintiff: Annette Sharlene Elder-Evins
Defendant: Michael J. Casey, Caroline L. Fowler, Michael Whitaker, Samantha K. Lynch, Michael J. Reynolds, Eric Major, Tom Schwedhelm, Shacklett, Agents of City of Santa Rosa, Rodney A. Dole, Chris Thomas, Leslie Kagel, Stephen Passalacqua, Agents of County of Sonoma, Kenneth Gnoss, Virginia Marcodia, Richard Chivaro, Edmund G. Brown, Jr., Arnold Schwarzenegger and Agents and Officers of the State of California
Case Number: 4:2009cv05775
Filed: December 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER Regarding Competency Examination. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/10/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2012)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER Re Exhibit list, witness list, and exhibits (with information to be provided by Tuesday, September 25, 2012, at 2 p.m.) (JUDGE BEELER, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER regarding June 21, 2012 Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/19/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
February 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER re: (1) 198 the parties' stipulation to continue the competency hearing and (2) hearing on 200 Plaintiff's motion to exclude records. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 02/10/2012.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2012)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 190 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time re: 115 Defendant's motion re: Plaintiff's competency. Plaintiff's opposition brief is now due by February 9, 2012. Defendant's reply brief is now due by February 23, 2012. The hearing is continued to March 15, 2012 (not March 1, 2012, as the parties' stipulated). Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/15/2011. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 173 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend 1 Complaint,, (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 173 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend. Case Management Conference set for 1/11/2012 04:00 PM. Responses due by 11/8/2011. Replies due by 11/22/2011. Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2011 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/12/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 177 STIPULATION AND ORDER Lifting Stay of Deposition of Dr. Apostle re 174 . Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/12/2011. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 107 Motion for Leave to File; terminating 114 Motion for Extension of Time to File; terminating 114 Motion ; terminating 133 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER re 162 Objection filed by Annette Sharlene Elder-Evins. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 8/30/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER re 142 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing. The motion hearing set for June 28, 2011 is vacated and the matter is submitted on the papers. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 110 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 40 Motion to Seal; granting 84 Motion to Dismiss; granting 90 Motion to Dismiss; granting 94 Motion to Dismiss (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 77 Motion for Extension of Time to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 59 Motion to Dismiss; granting 9 Motion to Dismiss; granting 12 Motion to Dismiss; granting 15 Motion to Dismiss (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elder-Evins v. Casey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Sharlene Elder-Evins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroline L. Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha K. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Schwedhelm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shacklett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agents of City of Santa Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney A. Dole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Kagel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Passalacqua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agents of County of Sonoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Gnoss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Marcodia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Chivaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agents and Officers of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?