Leung et al v. Cigna Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Johnson Leung and Carina Sinsi Leung
Defendant: Cigna Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 4:2010cv00620
Filed: February 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/12/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT re 55 Proposed Order filed by Carina Sinsi Leung, Johnson Leung. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/9/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 41 Joint MOTION to Continue Joint Request to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Cigna. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/8/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/15/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/5/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 39 Notice (Other) filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Case Management Statement due by 8/4/2011. Case Management Conference set for 8/11/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/5/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 37 Stipulation filed by Carina Sinsi Leung, Johnson Leung. Case Management Conference set for 7/7/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/22/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Denying in part and Granting in part 23 Motion to Declare Standard of Review and/or Order Discovery (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE AND ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/112/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
October 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. Signed by Judge Laporte on 10/7/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2010)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR PLAINTIFF JOHNSON LEUNG TO ATTEND THE MEDIATION TELEPHONICALLY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on October 1, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS DEFENDANT CIGNA, AMEND COMPLAINT AND WITHDRAW MOTION TO DISMISS re 9 Stipulation filed by Cigna Life Insurance Company of North America. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/29/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/3/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leung et al v. Cigna Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnson Leung
Represented By: Scott D. Righthand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carina Sinsi Leung
Represented By: Scott D. Righthand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Adrienne Clare Publicover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?