Bridgewater v. Hayes Valley Limited Partnership et al
Plaintiff: Sharon Bridgewater
Defendant: Hayes Valley Limited Partnership, McCormack Baron Ragan Management Services Inc., MBA Urban Development Co., Related Companies of California, Inc., The and Sunamerica Affordable Housing Partnership Inc.
Case Number: 4:2010cv00703
Filed: February 18, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/6/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 117 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants, DENYING 117 Motion to Issue Summons; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 117 Motion to Correct Complaint and to Toll Statue of Limitation. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 2/13/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2012) Modified on 2/14/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/14/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 117 Motion for Extension of Time to File; denying 117 Motion ; denying 117 Motion to Amend/Correct ; (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2012)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting (74) Motion to Reopen Case; terminating (85) Motion to Set Aside Judgment; terminating (95) Motion to Shorten Time; terminating (96) Motion to Shorten Time; terminating (98) Motion to Shorten Time; terminating (98) M otion for Leave to File; terminating (100) Motion for Order to Show Cause; terminating (103) Motion to Set Aside Judgment; terminating (105) Motion to Reopen Case; terminating (107) Motion for Leave to File; terminating (108) Motion for Leave to File in case 4:10-cv-00703-SBA; granting (36) Motion to Reopen Case; terminating (40) Motion to Set Aside Judgment; terminating (43) Motion to Shorten Time; terminating (44) Motion to Shorten Time; terminating (46) Motion to Set Aside Judgment; terminating (48) Motion to Reopen Case; terminating (50) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:10-cv-00704-SBA (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Referring Matter for Determination of Relatedness. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/24/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 8/24/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 15 Motion to Relate Cases: C-09-3639-SBA; C-09-5663-SBA; C-10-703-SBA; C-10-704-SBA. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 3/30/10. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bridgewater v. Hayes Valley Limited Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Bridgewater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hayes Valley Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCormack Baron Ragan Management Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MBA Urban Development Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Related Companies of California, Inc., The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunamerica Affordable Housing Partnership Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?