Carr v. Allied Waste Systems of Alameda County et al
Plaintiff: Fred C. Carr, Jr.
Defendant: Allied Waste Systems of Alameda County, Ray Atkinson, Fred Penning, Brotherhood of the Teamsters Local Union #70, Dominic Chiovare and Joe Silva
Case Number: 4:2010cv00715
Filed: February 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 87 Motion for Leave to File (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 2/18/2011. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/18/2011: # 1 Certificate of Service) (nah, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 2/7/2011. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 6/3/2010. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER vacating hearing on 19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 5/3/2010. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carr v. Allied Waste Systems of Alameda County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred C. Carr, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Waste Systems of Alameda County
Represented By: Amy K Skryja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Atkinson
Represented By: Amy K Skryja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Penning
Represented By: Amy K Skryja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brotherhood of the Teamsters Local Union #70
Represented By: Antonio Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic Chiovare
Represented By: Antonio Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Silva
Represented By: Antonio Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?