Kennedy v. Bank of America National Association et al
Plaintiff: Claudia Kennedy
Defendant: Bank of America National Association, Bank of America Corporation, Steve Owen and Bank of America
Case Number: 4:2010cv00868
Filed: March 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING DEFENDANTS 36 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING DEFENDANTS 33 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 6 Motion to Dismiss (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re 15 Granting Stipulation. Case Management Statement is due on 7/8/2010. Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2010 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/15/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re 13 Granting Stipulation TO CHANGE TIME PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 6-2. Case Management Conference set for 7/1/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/28/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy v. Bank of America National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Kennedy
Represented By: John B. McMorrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America National Association
Represented By: Sarah E. Coats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Sarah E. Coats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Owen
Represented By: Sarah E. Coats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?