Morelli v. Network Financial Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Giovanna Morelli
Defendant: Network Financial Group, Inc., Power Default Services, Inc and American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2010cv00934
Filed: March 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/29/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Vacating 29 Hearing Date (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS (PRIVATE) re 34 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR filed by Power Default Services, Inc, American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc., Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/21/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/25/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morelli v. Network Financial Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giovanna Morelli
Represented By: Marc C. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Network Financial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Default Services, Inc
Represented By: Joren Surya Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Joren Surya Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?