Schiff et al v. Barrett et al
Plaintiff: Frederick Schiff
Defendant: Teresa Barrett, The City and County of San Francisco, The San Francisco Police Commission, Joe Marshall, Thomas Mazzucco, Petra DeJesus, David Onek, Vincent Pan and James Hammer
Case Number: 4:2010cv01051
Filed: March 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER granting 179 Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part 201 Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part 207 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/12/2011. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 149 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 171 Motion for Summary Judgment (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 116 Ex Parte Application (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 80 Motion to Amend/Correct ; denying 85 Motion to Dismiss; granting Motion to Strike in part and denying it in part (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/21/2011. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE OF ERRATA re 78 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 12/14/2010. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2010)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 63 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE MOTION TO DISMISS HEARING re 70 Stipulation filed by Frederick Schiff. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/26/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 24 Motion to Dismiss; denying 28 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 30 Motion for Writ of Mandamus (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2010)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS (MEDIATION) re 51 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation filed by James Hammer, Teresa Barrett, Thomas Mazzucco, The City and County of San Francisco, David Onek, Petra DeJesus, Vincent Pan, Joe Marshall, Case referred to mediation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/6/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 6/3/2010. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/8/2010. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/11/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schiff et al v. Barrett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Schiff
Represented By: Thomas Kevin Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Barrett
Represented By: Lauren Marie Monson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Lauren Marie Monson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The San Francisco Police Commission
Represented By: Lauren Marie Monson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Marshall
Represented By: Lauren Marie Monson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Mazzucco
Represented By: Lauren Marie Monson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petra DeJesus
Represented By: Lauren Marie Monson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Onek
Represented By: Lauren Marie Monson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Pan
Represented By: Lauren Marie Monson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hammer
Represented By: Lauren Marie Monson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?