Terrell v. Harder Mechanical Contractors Inc et al
Plaintiff: Linda Terrell
Defendant: Gene Arceneaux, Flour Construction and Harder Mechanical Contractors Inc
Case Number: 4:2010cv01080
Filed: March 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER Granting 169 Stipulation Dismissing Plaintiff's Claims Against All Defendants and Dismissing Defendant Harder's Cross-Claim FRCP 41(a)(2) and 41(c). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/19/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re Failure to Comply with Standing Order Re Discovery Disputes. Show Cause Response due by 7/15/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/06/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER re: Eugene Arceneaux's Attendance at Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/5/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER re 143 Plaintiff's Request to Exclude Defendant's Expert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 06/15/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER to Meet and Confer Re Discovery Disputes re 144 Letter filed by Linda Terrell, 145 Letter filed by Gene Arceneaux, Harder Mechanical Contractors Inc, Flour Construction, and 146 Letter filed by Linda Terrell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 06/13/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER Granting 141 Stipulation Extending Time To File Motion To Compel Discovery. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/7/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 133 EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DISCLOSURE OF REBUTTAL EXPERTS AND REPORTS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Order re 126 Non-Opposition to Arceneaux's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 102 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment is Withdrawn Pursuant to Stipulation. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/19/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER GRANTING 122 EX PARTE APPLICATION MOVING HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM JUNE 9, 2011 TO JUNE 23, 2011 (DOCKET NO. 122). 94 , 97 , 102 , 107 Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Case Management Statement due by 6/16/2011. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/11/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Docket Nos. 94, 97 and 107). Signed by Judge Wilken on 5/3/2011. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Regarding 82 March 21, 2011 Joint Discovery Letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/19/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Granting 81 Stipulation Extending Time To Disclose Identities and Reports of Expert Witnesses. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/31/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER RE 75 DEFENDANTS FLUOR CONSTRUCTION AND GENE ARCENEAUX' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/28/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER re Redacted Psychological Records. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/25/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRanting 67 Stipulation Request and Proposed Order Modifying Case Schedule. Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2011. Further Case Management Conference (whether or not motion filed) set for 6/2/2011 02:00 PM. Final Pretrial Conference s et for 9/27/2011 02:00 PM. Jury Selection set for 10/3/2011 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Jury Trial (10 day)set for 10/3/2011 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (to be filed) Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/24/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER re 57 Defendants' Motion for Rule 35 Exams, Production of Records, and Further Deposition of Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/19/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Denying 61 Ex Parte Application Extending Time To Disclose Identities And Reports Of Expert Witnesses. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE AND ORDER SETTING PHONE CONFERENCE. Parties to participate in telephonic conference re 57 joint letter. Telephonic conference set for 1/19/2011 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/12/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER RE EXCESS PAGES 57 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/06/11. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting re 45 Stipulation EXTENDING TIME TO DISCLOSE IDENTITIES AND REPORTS OF EXPERT WITNESSES. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/6/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER ENFORCING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOR MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/26/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re 35 Granting Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/13/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re 33 Granting Stipulation TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/4/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re 26 Granting Stipulation Selecting Private ADR. Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/15/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terrell v. Harder Mechanical Contractors Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene Arceneaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flour Construction
Represented By: Lori A. Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harder Mechanical Contractors Inc
Represented By: Elizabeth Williams, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Terrell
Represented By: Lawrence Dale Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?