J & J Sport Productions, Inc., v. Campos et al
Plaintiff: J & J Sport Productions, Inc.,
Defendant: Genaro Mato Campos, Larry Pearson Jones and Alfredo Hernandez
Case Number: 4:2010cv01250
Filed: March 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/23/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 45 Notice (Other) filed by J & J Sport Productions, Inc. Case Management Conference set for 2/24/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/26/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting 33 Motion to Strike (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 38 Stipulation filed by Genaro Mato Campos, Larry Pearson Jones. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/20/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/16/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Adopting Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 16 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by J & J Sport Productions, Inc., Objections to R&R due by 12/22/2010. Signed by Judge Laporte on 12/8/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Laporte on 10/12/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER of Reference to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/3/2010. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sport Productions, Inc., v. Campos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sport Productions, Inc.,
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genaro Mato Campos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Pearson Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfredo Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?