Gate Five Group LLC v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Gate Five Group LLC
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation and Zodax, L.P.
Case Number: 4:2010cv01288
Filed: March 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING 37 STIPULATION for Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/8/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re 21 Granting Stipulation selecting Mediation. Case referred to mediation. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/10/10. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re 18 Granting Stipulation to Further Extend Time for Defendants Zodax, L.P. and Costco Wholesale Corporation to Answer Complaint. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/9/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re 16 Granting Stipulation to Further Extend Time for Defendants Zodax, L.P. and Costco Wholesale Corporation to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/12/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gate Five Group LLC v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gate Five Group LLC
Represented By: Anne Claire Hiaring Hocking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Aaron Joseph Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zodax, L.P.
Represented By: Aaron Joseph Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?