Outin v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Marvin L. Outin
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 4:2010cv01764
Filed: April 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 30 Stipulation for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/7/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 21 Stipulation FOR A SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE A MOTION AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/7/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment Responses due by 2/7/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011)(Entered on 1/7/2011)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re 14 Granting Stipulation to extend Plaintiff's time to file Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/26/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010) Modified on 10/26/2010 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Outin v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin L. Outin
Represented By: David Paul Waggoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?