Northwest Administrators, Inc. v. El Camino Paving, Inc.
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators, Inc.
Defendant: El Camino Paving, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2010cv01950
Filed: May 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Adopting 29 Report and Recommendations as to 14 Motion for Default Judgment. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2010) (Entered on 1/3/2011).
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 14 MOTION for Default Judgment and Attorneys' Fees filed by Northwest Administrators, Inc. Objections to R&R due by 12/29/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/15/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting re 23 Ex Parte Application For Order to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 1/18/2011. Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/29/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re 8 Default. Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/21/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Administrators, Inc. v. El Camino Paving, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Camino Paving, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?