Black et al v. Google Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Gary Black and Holli Beam-Black
Defendant: Google Inc.
Case Number: 4:2010cv02381
Filed: May 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER of USCA: motions to stay 8/13/10 and 9/20/10 USDC orders are denied. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2010)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER of USCA lifting stay order and appeal shall proceed as to 31 Notice of Appeal filed by Gary Black, Holli Beam-Black (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 32 PLAINTIFFS' Motion to Stay; DENYING 29 DEFENDANT'S Motion to Strike; 28 DENYING PLAINTIFFS' Objection; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to GARY BLACK and HOLLI BEAM-BLACK (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 20, 2010 Filing 36 Rebuttal to defendant's opposition re motion to stay filed byHolli Beam-Black, Gary Black. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER of USCA: proceedings shall be held in abeyance pending the district court's resolution of the 8/25/2010 & 8/30/2010 pending motions as to 31 Notice of Appeal filed by Gary Black, Holli Beam-Black (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 15, 2010 Filing 34 Memorandum in Opposition re 32 MOTION to Stay re 26 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed byGoogle Inc.. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 9/15/2010) Modified on 9/16/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2010 Filing 33 USCA Case Number 10-16992 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for 31 Notice of Appeal filed by Gary Black, Holli Beam-Black. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 10, 2010 Filing 32 MOTION to Stay re 26 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Holli Beam-Black, Gary Black. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 10, 2010 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 26 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Holli Beam-Black, Gary Black. Filing fee $ 455. Appeal Record due by 10/12/2010. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
August 31, 2010 Filing 30 Reply re 29 OBJECTION and MOTION to Strike Objection filed byHolli Beam-Black, Gary Black. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 30, 2010 Filing 29 OBJECTION and MOTION to Strike plaintiffs' 28 "Objection" by Google Inc.. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 8/30/2010) Modified on 8/31/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2010 Filing 28 OBJECTIONS to re 26 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Holli Beam-Black, Gary Black. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 13, 2010 Filing 27 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Google Inc. against Gary Black, Holli Beam-Black (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 13, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. 26 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 10 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; DENYING 15 Plaintiffs' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to Gary Black and Holli Beam-Black (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 25 OBJECTIONS to re 23 Plaintiffs' Declaration for Damages by Google Inc.. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 8/10/2010) Modified on 8/11/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2010 Filing 24 CLERKS NOTICE TAKING MOTIONS UNDER SUBMISSION (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
August 5, 2010 Filing 23 Declaration For Damages by Holli Beam-Black, Gary Black. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
July 29, 2010 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re 21 Declaration in Support, 20 Reply Memorandum Certificate of Service Non-ECF Filers (Volkmer, Bart) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
July 29, 2010 Filing 21 Declaration of Bart E. Volkmer in Support of 20 Reply Memorandum filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 20 ) (Volkmer, Bart) (Filed on 7/29/2010) Modified on 7/30/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2010 Filing 20 Reply in Support of its 10 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed byGoogle Inc.. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 7/29/2010) Modified on 7/30/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2010 Filing 19 Rebuttal to Opposition re 15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed byHolli Beam-Black, Gary Black. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 22, 2010 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE NON-ECF FILERS by Google Inc. re 17 Memorandum in Opposition (Kramer, David) (Filed on 7/22/2010) Modified on 7/23/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2010 Filing 17 Memorandum in Opposition re 15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed byGoogle Inc.. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 7/22/2010) Modified on 7/23/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2010 Filing 16 Brief filed byHolli Beam-Black, Gary Black. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re 8 Granting Stipulation EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/12/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
July 8, 2010 Filing 15 RESPONSE to re [10 MOTION TO DISMISS, and MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Holli Beam-Black, Gary Black. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2010 02:00 PM. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/7/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
July 2, 2010 Filing 13 Declaration of of Gary Black with exhibits A-L filed byHolli Beam-Black, Gary Black. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 proof of service)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
July 2, 2010 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re 9 Certificate of Interested Entities, 10 MOTION to Dismiss, 8 Stipulation (Kramer, David) (Filed on 7/2/2010) Modified on 7/7/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2010 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss)(Kramer, David) (Filed on 7/2/2010) Modified on 7/7/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2010 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google Inc. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 7/2/2010) Modified on 7/7/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2010 Filing 8 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Google Inc., Holli Beam-Black, Gary Black. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 7/2/2010) Modified on 7/7/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE: Case Management Statement due by 9/7/2010. Case Management Conference set for 9/14/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/17/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 17, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. 6 Order Reassigning Case (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Claudia Wilken for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/16/10. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2010)
June 15, 2010 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
June 14, 2010 Filing 4 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Google Inc.. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 10, 2010 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gary Black, Holli Beam-Black. Google Inc. served on 6/1/2010, answer due 6/22/2010. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
May 28, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/2/2010. Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/28/10. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 28, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT /no process against Google Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 44611005219.). Filed byGary Black, Holli Beam-Black. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black et al v. Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holli Beam-Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: David H. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?