Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund and its Joint Board of Trustees et al v. Scott
Plaintiff: Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund and its Joint Board of Trustees, Les Proteau, Charles Del Monte, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund and its Joint Board of Trustees, Doug Christopher, John Maggiore, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman & Apprentice Training Trust Fund, Marian Bourboulis and District Council 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades
Defendant: Royal Scott , Jr.
Case Number: 4:2010cv02386
Filed: May 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 WRIT of Execution issued in the amount of $37,545.50 as to Royal Scott, Jr. dba Royalty Pro Painting aka California Professional Painters (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF A RENEWED WRIT OF EXECUTION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/21/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 41 Request to Expedite Ruling on Issuance of Abstract of Judgment Including AKA Defendant. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 WRIT of Execution issued in the sum of $37,086.19 ($37,079.52 plus $6.67 interest accrued since entry of judgment). Signed by Deputy Clerk Kirkpatrick on 12/1/10. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re 15 Default, ***Deadlines terminated. Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/12/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund and its Joint Board of Trustees et al v. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund and its Joint Board of Trustees
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Les Proteau
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Del Monte
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund and its Joint Board of Trustees
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Christopher
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Maggiore
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman & Apprentice Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian Bourboulis
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Scott , Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?