United States v. Miles et al
Plaintiff: United States
Defendant: Mary Elizabeth Miles, Kristina A. Miles-Toland and JP Morgan Chase Co.
Case Number: 4:2010cv02398
Filed: May 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 82 Stipulation to Stay Case. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER FOR STATUS REPORTS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/10/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2012)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 73 Stipulation to Stay Case. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Requiring Parties to Meet and Confer. Signed by Chief Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/5/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER re July 9, 2012 letter sent by Plaintiff's counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on July 13, 2012. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER re 61 Letter filed by United States, granting request for telephonic appearance AS MODIFIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on July 11, 2012. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS 26 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting 42 Stipulation to Continue Hearing 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment set for 10/6/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Case Management Statement due by 9/29/2011. Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/21/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting 40 Stipulation STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON 26 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION. Case Management Statement due by 8/4/2011. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/11/2011 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/23/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 36 Stipulation TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION. Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2011. Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/3/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 29 Stipulated MOTION for extension of time to hear 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment and ENE Conference. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 3/17/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/8/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. Miles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Blake D. Stamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Elizabeth Miles
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristina A. Miles-Toland
Represented By: J. Brittain Habegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?